NOT HOME ALONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of people over 65 who live on their own and do not have any family in the area by organising social events that will help them have a happier life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 August 2016: CIO registration
- NHA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NINA LUCINDA STOBART | Chair | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MISS CATHY MOLLOY | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY LILIAN KROGH NIELSEN | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.50k | £10.73k | £3.29k | £1.13k | £10.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.12k | £14.92k | £4.49k | £11.31k | £8.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE OVER 65 WHO LIVE ON THEIR OWN AND DO NOT HAVE ANY FAMILY IN THE AREA BY ORGANISING SOCIAL EVENTS THAT WILL HELP THEM ENJOY A HAPPIER LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Wentworth Road
GRIMSBY
DN34 4AR
- Phone:
- 07702528612
- Email:
- nothomealone@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window