Trustees LYMINGTON BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1166376

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mark Timothy Kingston Corcoran | Chair | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Elaine Edwards | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Doel | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Timothy Hilbourne | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Tsoulli | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Downie Anderson | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Darren James Rayner Cooke | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Stevens | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Beer | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.