EDALE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall and recreation ground for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Edale without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 April 2024
Total income includes £238 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 August 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIA THOMPSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Whitaker Snow | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Martina Hardy | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Kate Burnett | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew John Critchlow | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Shirt | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Cunningham | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Lawford | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Spingys | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE JACKSON | Trustee | 11 February 2013 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/04/2020 | 07/04/2021 | 07/04/2022 | 07/04/2023 | 07/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.69k | £29.30k | £30.64k | £29.16k | £25.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.35k | £8.02k | £28.13k | £33.68k | £25.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £416 | £20.77k | £8.73k | £3.86k | £238 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 07/04/1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/09/2012
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF TE PARISH OF EDALE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WTH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) SUBJECT AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED, THE SAID LAND AND BUILDINGS SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 HOPE ROAD
EDALE
HOPE VALLEY
S33 7ZF
- Phone:
- 01433670138
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window