Financial history SPEED WORKS

Charity number: 1166429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £88.68k £44.38k £28.90k £1.86k £8.82k
Total expenditure £93.33k £44.48k £37.85k £6.12k £8.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A