MARYGATE PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HO
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 28 June 2016: CIO registration
- 12 July 2018: Funds received from 1038456 MARYGATE PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Victoria Dunhill | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Stone | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA STEVENSON | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSIE YOUNG | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £71.49k | £66.48k | £77.04k | £71.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £72.66k | £68.78k | £72.68k | £70.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUANTUMA
RESOLUTION HOUSE
12 MILL HILL
LEEDS
LS1 5DQ
- Phone:
- 0113 242 0808
- Email:
- BLAZEJ.NOWACZYK@QUANTUMA.COM
- Website:
-
WWW.QUANTUMA.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window