Trustees FRIENDS OF THE POTTERIES MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY, STOKE ON TRENT
Charity number: 507834

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Wilson | Chair | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
GLENN ROADLEY | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MIRANDA GOODBY | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Philip Bloor | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hassall | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET WHITE | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARY DUROSE | Trustee | 15 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MOUNTAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN LAWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.