THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BASILDON,ST MARTIN OF TOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Martin of Tours PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent to promote in the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the church: pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for St. Martin's Church and Churchyard, Church Hall, Pastoral Centre and Basildon Bell Tower.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 01 June 2016: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARTINS'S PCC,BASILDON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Brampton | Chair | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA ETHEL FISHER | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshuva Job | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Schofield | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ancelin Thankamony | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Samuel | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
TRACY WHITT | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Julia Plant | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elkin Neblett | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Reid | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Fry | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL ROBIN LOWE | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
LORI MCGREEVY | Trustee | 12 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.49k | £61.08k | £80.30k | £83.13k | £90.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.54k | £58.09k | £61.08k | £86.86k | £79.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 April 2022 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 April 2022 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2021 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2021 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST HOUSE
GOLDSMITHS
SOUTH HILL
LANGDON HILLS
BASILDON
SS16 6JB
- Phone:
- 01268414355
- Email:
- stmbas01@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window