WAT SRI INTRA ATULA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To enhance goodwill and religious ties with the other religions. 2) To propagate the Buddhist teaching to those who are interested. 3) To provide a place of worship and give spiritual refuge for all Buddhists in the UK irrespective of their Ethnic origins.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 August 2016: CIO registration
- 28 November 2018: Funds received from 1149071 BUDDHA METTA CAMBRIDGE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHRA THONG-IN SAWEANGPHON | Chair | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Phra Mana Atulo | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rampai Kunpochai | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dhammasathit Chanpreeda | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Chapman | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phrakhruakkhathammanusat Hemla | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Yelland | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.40k | £65.40k | £73.47k | £253.44k | £191.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.17k | £50.15k | £56.51k | £65.56k | £91.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEDIATION OR CHANTING OR DHAMMA TALKS AND PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON BUDDHISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wat Sri Intra Atula
Copthorne Bank
Copthorne
CRAWLEY
RH10 3JD
- Phone:
- 01342523852
- Email:
- watsriintraatula@gmail.com
- Website:
-
watsriintraatula
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window