GILLINGHAM YOUTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gillingham Youth Foundation enables the continued function of the Youth & Community buildings to provide a regular place for local youth and community groups, clubs and other charitable organisations to meet on a regular basis, without prejudice or discrimination on the grounds of gender, race, colour, ethnic or national origin, sexuality, disability, religious or political belief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 02 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Walsh | Chair | 10 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Waistell | Trustee | 17 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA RIDOUT | Trustee | 10 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.29k | £24.10k | £33.15k | £34.12k | £27.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.64k | £23.31k | £28.87k | £30.75k | £30.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £383 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GILLINGHAM DORSET AND ITS HINTERLAND AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE LODBOURNE AND TOWN WARDS (THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 2. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF : (A) ADVANCING THEM IN LIFE AND HELPING THEM BY DEVELOPING THEIR LIFE SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AN INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION, INCLUDING: · COMMUNITY EDUCATION; · PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE; · TRAINING (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING) AND LIFE-LONG LEARNING; · RESEARCH AND ADDING TO COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF SPECIFIC AREAS OF STUDY AND EXPERTISE; · THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT THROUGH WORKING WITH PARTNERS, ANSBURY (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 1160444) AND THE LOCAL JOB CLUBS TO GIVE ADVICE AND SUPPORT; (D) PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES ALL WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gillingham Youth & Community Centre
Cemetery Road
GILLINGHAM
SP8 4AZ
- Phone:
- 07496413114
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window