Financial history STREAM WALK TRUST

Charity number: 1171504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.61k £3.46k £9.97k £28.58k £52.51k
Total expenditure £10.69k £5.33k £10.02k £24.94k £35.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £998 N/A N/A £11.55k