STREAM WALK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a creative and inclusive outdoor space for community members from Whitstable and the surrounding area. To promote gardening and nature-based activities as a route to greater social cohesion, improved mental health, reduced isolation and general well-being. To provide opportunities for connection and education for all ages on topics related to sustainable horticulture and biodiversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,550 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 07 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Veronica Margaret Wheatley | Chair | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Chatwin | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nicholas Dennis | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tudor Spencer | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Ann Murray | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN RUTHERFORD | Trustee | 22 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE TONKIN | Trustee | 22 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.61k | £3.46k | £9.97k | £28.58k | £52.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.69k | £5.33k | £10.02k | £24.94k | £35.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £998 | N/A | N/A | £11.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN CANTERBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE GARDEN; AND 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING ABOUT HORTICULTURE, NATURAL CRAFTS AND SUSTAINABLE LIVING.
Area of benefit
IN CANTERBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
129 Cromwell Road
WHITSTABLE
Kent
CT5 1NH
- Phone:
- 07540175716
- Email:
- streamwalkcg@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window