CREATING ADVENTURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creating Adventures enriches the lives of adults aged 18 onwards with Autism and learning disabilities through a programme of activities. We aim to inspire them to try something new, ignite the interest by encouraging them to learn new skills and finally see them blossom and light up as they find their inner talent. We aim for our members to be the best that they can be and reach their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 24 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Harris | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Williams | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jackson | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kellie Gray | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roz Healey | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Joseph Neill | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Summersfield | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Steel | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.34k | £57.54k | £41.30k | £79.11k | £84.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.79k | £28.54k | £40.94k | £80.27k | £71.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONG ADULTS WITH AUTISM AND OTHER COMPLEX LEARNING DISABILITIES LIVING IN MANCHESTER, CHESHIRE, LANCASHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN MANCHESTER, CHESHIRE, LANCASHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Creating Adventures
Orford Community Hub
Festival Avenue
WARRINGTON
WA2 9EP
- Phone:
- 01925 500136
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window