Financial history ENSBURY PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1168501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £18.70k £23.84k £29.99k £24.02k £24.89k
Total expenditure £14.82k £12.53k £25.80k £12.17k £17.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.65k £17.67k N/A N/A