WATCH (WOMEN AND THE CHURCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In furtherance of its objects the Charity organises events and meetings alongside the meetings of the General Synod of the Church of England and on other occasions, responds to issues raised by members and others, and publishes articles, reports and analysis with a particular focus on the role of women at all levels in the church. We also participate in consultations and working groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martine Amelia Oborne | Chair | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Georgia Anne Ashwell | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Susan Hammersley | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Kristin Lynn Breuss Vice Chair | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Canon Jennifer Thomas Vice Chair | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Catharine Alison Rhodes | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Canon Elizabeth Lawes Taylor | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Dr Mary Kells | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Naomi Jane Nixon | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Yvonne Clarke | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Frances Anne Peggy Jackson | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Dr Michael John Firbank | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Professor Helen King | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Jane Oldham | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.62k | £20.02k | £20.34k | £19.80k | £25.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.46k | £16.53k | £22.24k | £31.06k | £32.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Jan 2017 as amended on 12 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF GENDER EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITHIN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS EXPERIENCED BY BOTH LAY AND ORDAINED PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN GENDER EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF GENDER EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Ashford Close
FORDINGBRIDGE
Hampshire
SP6 1DH
- Phone:
- 07853302841
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window