Accounts and annual returns CHAPTER 2 LONDON

Charity number: 1166653
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 March 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 March 2022 55 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time