INSPIRE COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community Garden near to the centre of Chesterfield, where our volunteers meet, grow fruit and vegetables and enjoy the outdoor life in a sustainable way. Our plot was an acre of wasteland which we are bringing back into cultivation as we continue our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 29 June 2016: CIO registration
- CHESTERFIELD ORGANIC DEMONSTRATION GARDEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Thompson | Chair | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Cragg | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Allen | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mr Chris Brooks | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Fallon | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.82k | £2.56k | £1.24k | £657 | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.43k | £1.24k | £707 | £1.40k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS RESIDING IN CHESTERFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE FACILITATION OF A COMMUNITY GARDENING, GROWING AND HORTICULTURAL PROJECT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF SUSTAINABLE HORTICULTURE. 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL NEED WITH FOOD WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD TO BUY DUE TO LACK OF MEANS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Brockwell Lane
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S40 4EE
- Phone:
- 07922 011637
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window