IMPACT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our primary focus is on the promotion of resilience and sustainable development. Accordingly, our programmatic and partnership efforts seek to promote basic literacy, environmental literacy, health literacy, political literacy, shareholder literacy, civic literacy and professional / workplace literacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 10 May 2016: Standard registration
- THE IMPACT TRUST (Working name)
- THE SEED IMPACT TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY HAROLD NOTCUTT | Chair | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Walter CLaus Heinrich Wehrmeyer | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Patrick McInerney | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Bellamy | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Gerard Mario Salole | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Benedict Peile | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.00k | £195.93k | £177.00k | £90.13k | £123.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.49k | £149.57k | £157.00k | £135.95k | £162.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 06 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: 1. PROMOTING COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING IN RESPECT OF COMMUNITIES WHICH ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PROMOTING THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING: (A) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY, SKILLS AND SELF-RELIANCE OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY MEMBERS SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (B) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO COMMUNITY MEMBERS IN FINDING AND SECURING EMPLOYMENT; (C) PROVIDING CAPITAL GRANTS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO LAND AND/OR BUILDINGS AT BELOW MARKET OR SUBSIDISED RATES TO ASSIST IN THE START UP OF COMMUNITY BASED ENTERPRISES AND COOPERATIVES WITH A VIEW TO INCREASING EMPLOYMENT, SELF-SUFFICIENCY AND SUSTAINABLE LIVELIHOODS IN POOR, UNDER RESOURCED AND UNDER EDUCATED COMMUNITIES. 2. THE PROMOTION OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR, IN SOUTH AFRICAÆS TOWNSHIPS) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUTH AND UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE. (D) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO PROVIDE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE THROUGH INTERNSHIPS, WORK PLACEMENT OR OTHER SHORT AND/OR LONG-TERM OPPORTUNITIES. (E) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP (I) IN DEVELOPING THE SKILLS THEY NEED TO SECURE EMPLOYMENT AND/OR ESTABLISH THEIR OWN BUSINESS; (II) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT WITHIN EXISTING BUSINESSES. (F) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS. (G) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING: O SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3. PREVENTING OR RELIEVING POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES AND/OR INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL EDUCATION, SKILLS TRAINING, FOOD SECURITY, NUTRITION AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 4. PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT MOST ESPECIALLY IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND DEGRADATION; INCLUDING: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL CITIZENSHIP. IN THESE OBJECTS SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS." 5. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION, DIVERSITY AND EQUALITY THROUGH UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND THE WAYS IN WHICH IT CAN BE OVERCOME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING THROUGH EDUCATION AND AWARENESS CAMPAIGNS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATION OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 KINGS LANE
WINDLESHAM
GU20 6JQ
- Phone:
- 07444382270
- Email:
- tamzin@impacttrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window