EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF PREVENTIVE MEDICINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness and to promote and protect good health through research, education and awareness of the prevention and treatment of chronic diseases with a focus on cardiovascular diseases, cancer, diabetes and obesity to help reduce the burden of these diseases in the UK, Europe and across the globe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Austria
- Belgium
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Israel
- Monaco
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 29 June 2016: CIO registration
- ESPREVMED (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR P4 MEDICINE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MICHAEL SAGNER | Chair | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Siow | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 182 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 30 January 2023 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 30 January 2023 | 363 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH THROUGH RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CHRONIC DISEASES WITH A FOCUS ON CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, CANCER, DIABETES AND OBESITY TO HELP REDUCE THE BURDEN OF THESE DISEASES IN EUROPE AND ACROSS THE GLOBE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37A South Parade
OXFORD
OX2 7JN
- Phone:
- 0788548982
- Email:
- office@espm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window