Financial history BEDAZZLE

Charity Number: 1166683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £42.25k £50.13k £45.96k £74.29k £52.67k
Total expenditure £49.87k £39.31k £55.63k £73.59k £55.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £8.50k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A