BEDAZZLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the charity involve visiting schools, workplaces and community settings, providing social, emotional and Mental Health support and education. We run in house projects that develop knowledge and skills under the remits of health, education, arts and life skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Telford & Wrekin
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 22 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Elizabeth Spencer | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gill Cole | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Grice | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLY SOKOLOWSKI | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE SHRIANE | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.25k | £50.13k | £45.96k | £74.29k | £52.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.87k | £39.31k | £55.63k | £73.59k | £55.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £8.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SUBJECT OF PERSONAL, SOCIAL AND HEALTH EDUCATION. 3) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING YOUNG PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priory House
2 Priory Road
Dudley
West Midlands
DY1 1HH
- Phone:
- 03300103121
- Email:
- info@bedazzle.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window