EFFECTIVE ALTRUISM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are building a community dedicated to encouraging, inspiring and supporting people to use evidence and reason to achieve their altruistic goals. We host a variety of events and workshops designed to teach new skills, improve understanding of causes and their solutions, and ultimately enable individuals to make the best altruistic decisions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 December 2016: CIO registration
- EFFECTIVE ALTRUISM LONDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Barnes | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Paterson | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Wen | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grayden Reece-Smith | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amrit Sidhu-Brar | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.76k | £52.76k | £114.37k | £252.55k | £140.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.96k | £69.37k | £131.40k | £239.97k | £138.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND CITIZENSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE, WITH A VIEW TO EDUCATING THEM ABOUT CHARITABLE GIVING AND TO IMPROVE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND EXPERIENCE IN PHILANTHROPY AND EFFECTIVE GIVING AND PROMOTING INDIVIDUAL CONTRIBUTIONS OF TIME, SKILLS AND MONEY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 19
Jarman House
Jubilee Street
London
E1 3BL
- Phone:
- 07932485772
- Email:
- hello@effectivealtruism.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window