THE OLD TALBOT HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Talbot House Association is responsible for maintaining Talbot Houses' independence and ensuring it remains an inspirational centre of peace and reconciliation providing physical, mental and spiritual refreshment for all visitors. It does so in perpetual memory of its role as a club for 'Every man' during the Great War.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Belgium
Governance
- 14 December 2016: CIO registration
- THE TALBOT HOUSE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gilbert Chalk | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Kerr | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Howard Benge | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN HUSSEIN | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAN JEROME CORNELIUS LOUAGIE | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM REN AGNES CORNEEL DE VLOO | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
LOUISA ESME EVANS | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev PAUL STEPHEN WRIGHT | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.56k | £19.14k | £10.36k | £7.39k | £6.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.85k | £13.89k | £7.87k | £5.47k | £4.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF TALBOT HOUSE AND THE CHAPEL AT POPERINGE, BELGIUM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE RELIGIOUS, HUMANITARIAN, HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL SIGNIFICANCE OF TALBOT HOUSE AND THE CHAPEL AT POPERINGE, BELGIUM, IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPORT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MUSEUM. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROMOTING THE USE OF TALBOT HOUSE AND THE CHAPEL AT POPERINGE, BELGIUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORCHARD HOUSE
HOLCOMBE HILL
HOLCOMBE
RADSTOCK
BA3 5DJ
- Phone:
- 02073210246
- Email:
- paul1871arl@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window