PRIZE FUNDS ADMINISTERED ICW GWENDRAETH VALLEY COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL

Charity number: 507871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide an annual award to a student that has made an outstanding contribution to the life of the school, academically or otherwise.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £65
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GME EVANS PRIZE (Working name)
  • GWENDRAETH COMPREHENSIVE PTA PRIZE (Working name)
  • HUW JONES MEMORIAL PRIZE (Working name)
  • WYNFORD DAVIES LATIN PRIZE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CARMARTHENSHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL Trustee 25 March 2022
GWOBR NORAH A BRYNIOG HOWELLS
Received: On time
THE GIFT OF NORAH AND BRYNIOG HOWELLS
Received: On time
PRIZE FUNDS ICW LLANDEILO COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
DR BETTY V JONES CHARITY
Received: On time
SARAH TEGFAN DAVIES SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time
YSGUBORSTONE, BRYNTEG PENTREMEURIG ROAD CARMARTHEN - OPEN SPACE
Received: On time
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
THE GWEN SLUMAN MORGAN PRIZE
Received: On time
T. BRYAN DAVIES EDUCATION TRUST AWARD
Received: On time
BRYNAMMAN SWIMMING BATH AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
THE CLAIRE WILLIAMS PRIZE
Received: On time
PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND, TYCROES
Received: On time
PRIZES CHARITIES
Received: On time
THOMAS DAVIES PENFFORDD PRIZE
Received: On time
MAES-YR-YRFA COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL CROSS HANDS CARNIVAL AWARD
Received: On time
GWOBR GOFFA MRS BETI HUGHES
Received: On time
CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNEXION WITH WHITLAND GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Received: On time
ARBOUR STEPHENS ORATION
Received: On time
TRIMSARAN RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
IWAN M REES Trustee 01 February 2013
THE GIFT OF NORAH AND BRYNIOG HOWELLS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7 £2 £1 £25 £65
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 February 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 MARCH 1983
Charitable objects
PROVISION IN EACH SCHOOL YEAR OF BOOKS TO BE PLACED IN THE SCHOOL LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 23 January 1984 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
HEAD OF FINANCIAL SERVICES
CORPORATE SERVICES DEPARTMENT
CARMARTHENSHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL
COUNTY HALL
CARMARTHEN
SA31 1JP
Phone:
01267234567
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available