BASINGSTOKE WOLVERINES ALLSTAR CHEERLEADING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for the recreation and leisure time occupation of young people between the ages of 5 to 25 in the interest of social welfare by the provision of training and performing in cheerleading activities so as to develop their physical and mental capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 01 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Connor | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MISS SUZY CATHERS | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARRON PRIMROSE Gibson | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.71k | £246.23k | £184.63k | £291.32k | £335.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.73k | £192.09k | £201.50k | £272.32k | £332.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.16k | £28.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND PERFORMING IN CHEERLEADING ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit E
Daneshill Central
Armstrong Road
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG24 8NU
- Phone:
- 07762770999
- Email:
- hello@cheerbasingstoke.co.uk
- Website:
-
cheerbasingstoke.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window