THE FRIENDS OF THE FALKLAND ISLANDS MUSEUM AND THE JANE CAMERON NATIONAL ARCHIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research and exploration into the maritime history of the Falkland Islands, including preservation of related artefacts, records and archives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Falkland Islands
Governance
- 20 July 2016: Standard registration
- FIMA FRIENDS (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE FALKLAND MUSEUM AND THE JANE CAMERON NATIONAL ARCHIVES (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Roberts | Chair | 03 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Henry Basden Holme | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Frank Howatt | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HONOURABLE ALEXANDRA MARY SWINFORD SHACKLETON | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM LESLIE BOUND | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MENSUN MICHAEL JOHN BOUND | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|||||
STEFAN FALKLAND HEIJTZ | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JIM H MCADAM | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
HUGH ANTHONY OSBORNE | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.36k | £11.65k | £42.61k | £8.41k | £7.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | £11.07k | £43.56k | £233.54k | £13.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 18 December 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FRIENDS SHALL BE TO SUPPORT A) THE CONSERVATION OF DOCUMENTS, BOOKS, ARTEFACTS AND OTHER ITEMS RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF THE FALKLAND ISLANDS AND B) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FALKLAND ISLANDS MUSEUM AND NATIONAL TRUST (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE MUSEUM") AND THE JANE CAMERON NATIONAL ARCHIVES OF THE FALKLAND ISLANDS (HEREINAFTER REFRERRED TO AS "THE ARCHIVES") IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE MANAGEMENT AND STAFF OF BOTH INSTITUTIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BDB PITMANS LLP
One Bartholomew Close
London
EC1A 7BL
- Phone:
- 034 5222 9222
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window