NIGHTLIFE OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To advance any social or charitable purpose or purposes; which will promote the regeneration for the public benefit, of areas of social and economic deprivation. 2) The preservation and protection of the LGBT and BAME communities who are affected by addiction, mental health or social exclusion by providing education, support and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 09 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LADY OLIVIA JANE RHODEN | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephan Sean Vincent Wendell Turner | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charnay Mckellar Mason | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Marcus | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Rhyce Lawrence | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.51k | £140.16k | £134.50k | £204.75k | £334.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.49k | £103.51k | £113.46k | £184.13k | £312.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.75k | £29.64k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 05 December 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 05 December 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 13 December 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 13 December 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH OF ANYONE WHO ACCESSES THE LGBT NIGHT TIME ECONOMY (LGBT NTE) WHO ARE EITHER TAKING DRUGS REGULARLY, ADDICTED TO DRUGS OR ALCOHOL AND WHO HAVE SUBSEQUENT MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND EDUCATION TO USERS OF THE LGBT NTE SO THEY ARE BETTER EQUIPPED TO AVOID A LIFE BLIGHTED BY ADDICTION · CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND ITS SUBSEQUENT EFFECT ON MENTAL HEALTH AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
24-32 Princip Street
BIRMINGHAM
B4 6LE
- Phone:
- 01217535311
- Email:
- info@nightlifeoutreach.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window