DR KOOL WANT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a financial acknowledgement to ex councillors (or spouses) who have served in the area of the Retford borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 August 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Richards | Chair | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Chambers | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS M F TERESA CRITCHLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Peter Masters | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121 | £79 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 April 2025 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2025 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27 APRIL 1978
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS OF THE FOLLOWING CLASSES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS:- (A) PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN COUNCILLORS OF BASSETLAW DISTRICT COUNCIL FOR ANY OF THE WARDS COMPRISING THE FORMER BOROUGH OF EAST RETFORD, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS; (B) PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN COUNCILLORS OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF EAST RETFORD, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadland
64 Ollerton Road
Ordsall
Retford
Nottinghamshire
DN22 7TQ
- Phone:
- 01777703927
- Email:
- koolwantcharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window