Financial history 41ST MEDWAY TOWNS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1167454
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £24.51k £12.16k £10.89k £22.31k £29.23k
Total expenditure £23.29k £13.54k £13.27k £18.92k £38.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A