LEEDS ALLIANCE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Services, Sunday School, Bible Studies and fellowship gatherings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 21 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wing Hong Wong | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Siu Boon MA | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Wing Yau Wong | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
In Peng LEI | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zhu Tzi JIM | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.60k | £48.22k | £39.68k | £30.66k | £51.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.57k | £52.96k | £49.06k | £35.03k | £44.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAY 2016 as amended on 25 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN YORKSHIRE AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STATEMENT SET OUT IN APPENDIX I OF THE GOVERNING DOCUMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A Blackman Lane
LEEDS
LS2 9ER
- Phone:
- 07897567550
- Email:
- admin@leedsallch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window