Accounts and annual returns THE BUS SHELTER IOW

Charity number: 1168576
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 August 2019 90 days late
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 December 2017 On Time