DC ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect the health of patients with Dyskeratosis Congenita and other Telomere Disorders, by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities, support services and educational materials. To advance the education of the general public, medical and scientific professionals in all areas relating to Dyskeratosis Congenita and other telomere disorders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Yvonne Whitehouse | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Willem Buckley | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Mary Buckley | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANE PAXTON | Trustee | 03 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Jane Longhurst | Trustee | 03 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.65k | £1.22k | £2.09k | £4.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £672 | £276 | £273 | £1.72k | £1.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS WITH DYSKERATOSIS CONGENITA AND OTHER TELOMERE DISORDERS, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PUBLICATION OF A WEBSITE, NEWSLETTERS, INFORMATION SHEETS AND OTHER MATERIALS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE AFFECTED BY DYSKERATOSIS CONGENITA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC PROFESSIONALS IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DYSKERATOSIS CONGENITA AND OTHER TELOMERE DISORDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Digby Crescent
London
N4 2HS
- Phone:
- 02088000027
- Email:
- info@dcaction.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window