ANDREW'S HEDGEHOG HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer and fund raiser to support the taking in and caring for injured and sick hedgehogs. Most of the hedgehogs coming in are from an area some thirty mile radius from our post code DN15 0DB..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Veronica Tett | Chair | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Francis Williams | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Joseph Parsons | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ducker | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH DAVIDSON | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.36k | £30.16k | £31.50k | £27.36k | £32.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.70k | £26.23k | £32.01k | £27.72k | £25.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO FURTHER THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEDGEHOG SPECIES IN LINCOLNSHIRE. B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF HEDGEHOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING A RESCUE, CARE AND REHABILITATION SERVICE FOR SICK, INJURED, OR ORPHANED HEDGEHOGS WITH THE AIM OF RELEASING SUCH HEDGEHOGS BACK INTO THE WILD WHEREVER POSSIBLE. C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF HEDGEHOGS AND IN THE CARE, METHODS OF TREATMENT, CONSERVATION AND HABITAT OF HEDGEHOGS. D) RESEARCH INTO ESTABLISHING A CAPTIVE BREEDING PROGRAMME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowlands
Lodge Farm
Clapp Gate
Appleby
Scunthorpe
DN15 0DB
- Phone:
- 01724872726
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window