Financial history Museum of Policing in Devon & Cornwall

Charity number: 1168731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £24.34k £78.13k £68.41k £133.70k £153.91k
Total expenditure £29.50k £59.61k £71.18k £111.16k £178.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A