Trustees Museum of Policing in Devon & Cornwall
Charity number: 1168731

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM ALAN SKELLY | Chair | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tom Charles Holmes | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irene Andrews | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rothwell | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rachel Powell | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Phyllis Crane | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Ann Walsh Alderson | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Frances Giles | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Laver | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MICHAEL WARD | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ULRIKE SABRINA RICHARDS | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Howard Bickley | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.