MATT'S GALLERY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Matt's Gallery creates opportunities for artists to push the boundaries of their practice, providing space, support, mentoring and resources for artists at all stages of their careers to create ambitious new works. Matt's Gallery presents free and accessible exhibitions of high quality visual contemporary arts, engaging students in free talks and seminars with artists and staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Ann Fernie | Chair | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Florence Carroll | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Mary Reed | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Victoria Kate Grimes | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Aaron Coxhead | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdullahi Bashe | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Coline Emmanuelle Marie Milliard | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Monique Barice | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN KLASSNIK | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £545.25k | £523.78k | £537.69k | £307.14k | £277.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £363.07k | £319.38k | £330.16k | £456.52k | £316.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £190.42k | £41.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £350.30k | £393.47k | £414.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £33.92k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £160.91k | £130.23k | £123.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £114 | £88 | £46 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £254.52k | £308.73k | £312.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £108.55k | £10.64k | £4.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £2.10k | £4.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £13.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: (1) PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE VISUAL CONTEMPORARY ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. PROMOTING AND EXHIBITING WORKS OF ARTISTIC EXCELLENCE; B. COMMISSIONING THE CREATION OF WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT; AND C. PROVIDING GALLERY AND STUDIO SPACE AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE CREATION AND PUBLIC DISPLAY OF WORK. (2) ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE VISUAL CONTEMPORARY ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. PROVIDING LECTURES, SEMINARS, PRACTICAL COURSES AND PUBLICATIONS; B. PROVIDING FACILITIES AND RESOURCES FOR ARTISTS, ART HISTORIANS, ART CRITICS, STUDENTS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC; AND C. CULTIVATING AND IMPROVING PRACTICAL AND THEORETICAL LITERACY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS, "VISUAL CONTEMPORARY ARTS" INCLUDES BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO SCULPTURE, PHOTOGRAPHY, PAINTING, PERFORMANCE, INSTALLATION, FILM AND VIDEO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Charles Clowes Walk
LONDON
SW11 7AN
- Phone:
- 02080673842
- Email:
- info@mattsgallery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window