Financial history J.I.Q BALASATH UK

Charity number: 1168265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £130.22k £128.79k £237.00k £268.66k £243.80k
Total expenditure £145.01k £125.08k £224.42k £260.18k £230.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A