ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HERITAGE

Charity number: 1167316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE OF BUILDINGS AND STRUCTURES OF HISTORICAL AND/OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST OR IMPORTANCE AT THE HOSPITAL AND ELSEWHERE IN THE CITY OF LONDON, AND THROUGH SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Robert Treharne Jones Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Dr Rupert William Evenett Trustee 17 January 2025
None on record
Dr CHARLES KNIGHT Trustee 24 December 2024
None on record
Amicia de Moubray Trustee 16 January 2024
GREAT COMP
Received: On time
Historic Houses Foundation
Received: On time
Douglas Russell Eden Harmer Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Clare Mary Maurice Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Christopher Mark Pemberton Trustee 16 January 2024
NMRN OPERATIONS
Received: On time
IRONBRIDGE GORGE MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ERIC GEORGE REYNOLDS Trustee 19 December 2023
SAVE BRITAIN'S HERITAGE
Received: On time
LONGPLAYER TRUST
Received: On time
SS ROBIN TRUST
Received: On time
THE CAMPAIGN FOR DRAWING
Received: 12 days late
THE GREENWICH FOUNDATION FOR THE OLD ROYAL NAVAL COLLEGE
Received: On time
MOSSBOURNE CHARITABLE TRUST CIO
Received: On time
THE GLORIANA TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony John Hales Trustee 19 December 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £926.22k £396.06k £570.37k £1.90m £1.60m
Total expenditure £780.64k £433.15k £361.66k £869.76k £757.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £151.60k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £921.75k N/A £495.77k £1.84m £1.55m
Income - Other trading activities £2.00k N/A £74.60k £47.81k £31.07k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £495.77k £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.46k N/A £0 £3.76k £15.87k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £733.55k N/A £300.49k £804.29k £694.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £47.08k N/A £61.17k £65.47k £63.16k
Expenditure - Governance £1.20k N/A £13.79k £31.23k £36.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Own use assets £0 N/A £0 £0 £1.57m
Long-term investments £0 N/A £0 £0 £1
Other assets £358.27k N/A £386.14k £1.48m £1.66m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £158.62k N/A £14.87k £85.53k £986.19k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 20 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SAFFERY CHAMPNESS
71 Queen Victoria Street
London
EC4V 4BE
Phone:
07970705382