NORRIE DISEASE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reference no: 061000035663 The activities of the CIO are to relieve the needs of those affected by Norrie disease by promoting greater understanding of the causes, symptoms and treatment of Norrie disease in all its forms including by the promotion of research and sharing and disseminating of results of such research for the benefit of the general public; raising public awareness of the symptoms
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY JOAN HORROBIN | Chair | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Reyers | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Robinson | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
THERESA PEACOCK | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
KELLY LOUISE LEGGETT | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.78k | £62.80k | £71.30k | £47.57k | £30.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.13k | £66.62k | £1.82k | £28.44k | £5.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE AFFECTED BY NORRIE DISEASE, THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS BY:- 1. PROMOTING GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF THE CAUSES, SYMPTOMS AND TREATMENT OF NORRIE DISEASE IN ALL ITS FORMS INCLUDING BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND SHARING AND DISSEMINATING OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC; 2. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE SYMPTOMS, NEEDS AND RELATED MEDICAL CONDITIONS OF THOSE LIVING WITH NORRIE DISEASE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Norrie Disease Foundation
PO Box 12476
COLCHESTER
CO1 9RB
- Phone:
- 01487898323
- Website:
-
WWW.NORRIEDISEASE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window