THE MUMMUM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The MumMum Foundation engages with numerous communities who have been affected by cancer: founded by a family who have witnessed first hand the struggle cancer creates. The MumMum Foundation' primary objective is to help put smiles on the faces of those who need them most. Funds raised go towards a meal out with loved ones, a trip to the theatre, a day out, a weekend away, that much needed holiday
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 20 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY MICHAEL VALENTINE-FULLER | Chair | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY NICOLE VALENTINE-FULLER | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.09k | £1.18k | £5.23k | £1.15k | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.50k | £216 | £441 | £1.78k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: (1) TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, AND TO SUPPORT THOSE PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MUMMUM FOUNDATION
C/O VALENTINE & TURNER
262 HIGH STREET
ORPINGTON
BROMLEY
BR6 0NB
- Phone:
- 01689798448
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window