SOCIAL METRICS COMMISSION
Charity Number: 1168100
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- City Of Westminster
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 July 2016: CIO registration
- 19 September 2018: Removed (Removed by application)
- 19 September 2018: Funds transferred to 1140719 THE LEGATUM INSTITUTE FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
- SMC (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
A. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF POVERTY.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window