OUT & PROUD AFRICAN LGBTI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUT AND PROUD AFRICAN LGBTI (OPAL) is a Charity formed by African LGBT activists in the UK. The charity was started to cater to the needs of those persecuted, going through persecution and the ones against the persecution of LGBTI people. OPAL now operates in the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 2016: CIO registration
- AFRICAN LGBTI (Working name)
- OUT & PROUD DIAMOND GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Atukunda | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mable Naluwooza | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
EDRISA KIYEMBA | Trustee | 10 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Abbey kiwanuka | Trustee | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.38k | £20.26k | £48.39k | £59.58k | £119.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.27k | £27.56k | £47.23k | £36.81k | £121.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY, DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER AND INTERSEX PERSONS (“LGBTI PERSONS”) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AFRICA BY (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (B) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; AND (D) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION. 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF LGBTI PERSONS INCLUDING ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES WHO ARE IN DISTRESS OR VULNERABLE ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SEXUALITY, GENDER IDENTITY OR IMMIGRATION STATUS 3. TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL, SEXUAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF LGBTI PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
198 Railton Road
Herne Hill
London
London
SE24 0JT
- Phone:
- 07788660994
- Email:
- info@africanlgbti.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window