BROWN EDGE VILLAGE HALL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Village Hall for Brown Edge people and people from the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 23 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ROY TURNER | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
EDWIN SIMS | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
WILLIAM HOLDCROFT | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
BERYL HULSTONE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
KERRY DAVID KNIGHT | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JANET MARGARET TURNER | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
NIGEL OWEN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.44k | £17.15k | £35.17k | £30.36k | £31.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.54k | £23.16k | £20.38k | £26.47k | £33.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £20.10k | £1.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 February 2021 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 February 2021 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BROWN EDGE, STOKE ON TRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AND WIDER AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glenhough
Sandy Lane
Brown Edge
Stoke-on-Trent
ST6 8QL
- Phone:
- 01782504239
- Email:
- secretary.bevh@brownedge.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window