THE FRIENDS OF CRYSTAL PALACE PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly gardening volunteering sessions Open the Information Centre at weekends and manage the facility for community groups to use in the week. Send out a Quartley newsletter to the community and promote park events and keep the park community informed Part of a Federation of Community Groups working on joint community projects and joint funding applications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bromley
Governance
- 18 November 2016: CIO registration
- FOCPP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hattie Ocal | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah WATTERS | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Anderson | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Moore | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Kues Johnson | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Vallade | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANITA DYSON | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.36k | £7.75k | £3.11k | £3.98k | £4.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.76k | £8.43k | £1.30k | £4.27k | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF CRYSTAL PALACE PARK, A GRADE II* LISTED HISTORIC PARK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL IN THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT, LOCAL AND NATIONAL HERITAGE AND HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND BIODIVERSITY OF CRYSTAL PALACE PARK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND TO PROMOTE SCIENCE IN RESPECT OF THE SAME; AND 3.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE INFORMATION CENTRE
CRYSTAL PALACE PARK
THICKET RD
LONDON
SE19 2GA
- Phone:
- 0208 771 9990
- Email:
- friendsofcpp@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window