Financial history RUNCORN LOCKS RESTORATION SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1170027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £33.24k £30.97k £33.65k £586 £24.39k
Total expenditure £33.09k £27.70k £35.15k £2.44k £20.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.59k £25.35k £29.46k N/A £18.15k