BURGESS SPORTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting sport and healthy activity in the local area. Supporting community clubs in their individual activities. Working with Creation and other stakeholders to improve access to sport and healthy activity for residents of the Aylesbury Estate Running of sports camps and afterschool activities for local children and training volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £85,600 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Southwark
Governance
- 09 January 2017: CIO registration
- 20 December 2023: Funds received from 1118009 THE ADAM COLE FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Jane Benstead | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ontario Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ganiat Folami | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Leo | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Yolanda Peake | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Callaway | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PUSEY MBE | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.57k | £302.90k | £301.16k | £216.02k | £158.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.04k | £239.47k | £223.26k | £250.32k | £236.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | £69.00k | £83.18k | £85.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 April 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 April 2022 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTHWARK AND LONDON THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK AND LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURGESS PARK TENNIS CLUB
44 Addington Square
LONDON
SE5 7LA
- Phone:
- 07792377472
- Email:
- info@burgesssports.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window