Financial history HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY NORTH WEST KENT

Charity number: 1167364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.38k £14.08k £21.98k £22.80k £25.35k
Total expenditure £20.96k £4.01k £3.05k £4.48k £12.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A