THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WASHINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Parochial Church Council is to promote in the parish of Washington the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, social and ecumenical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sunderland
Governance
- 04 August 2016: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY PCC WASHINGTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Teresa Margaret Walton | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Scarr | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Norton Slowther | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Scorer | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Talbot | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Wesley Alan Hindmarch | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Patricia Miller | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Gollan | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Petherick | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Janice Rutter | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Butler | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles Tyerman | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN PATRICIA HARRISON | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
PHYLLIS MARY WOOD | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS PETHERICK | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW CRESSWELL | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE MCINTYRE | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
BERYL NESBITT | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA FIDDY | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY EDWARD ANDREW POWELL | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE SANGHA | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WOOD | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.62k | £94.37k | £92.70k | £119.77k | £103.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.89k | £111.55k | £93.53k | £98.27k | £109.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
The Avenue
Washington
NE38 7LE
- Phone:
- 01914187911
- Email:
- htcwashington@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
holytrinitywashington.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window