Financial history BOXGROVE VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1167340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £49.84k £12.81k £40.01k £52.07k £46.17k
Total expenditure £72.98k £27.15k £30.56k £59.84k £47.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £6.02k £8.00k N/A N/A