GOOD NEWS RENEWAL MINISTRY (GNRM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING COPIES OF THE BIBLE IN VARIOUS FORMATS AND LANGUAGES, INCLUDING AUDIO SCRIPTURE IN A NUMBER OF LANGUAGES TO ORGANISATIONS, CHURCHES, INDIVIDUALS. PRISONS AND HOSPITALS IN THE UK AND ETHIOPIA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Ethiopia
- United States
Governance
- 27 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEMISHET DEMISSIE MED | Chair | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MESRAK KEBOTAL | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bereket Angulo | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amsale Tefera | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.84k | £3.70k | £1.73k | £776 | £4.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68 | £6.03k | £8.05k | £1.03k | £3.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 26 February 2025 | 728 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 14 May 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | 14 May 2021 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING COPIES OF THE BIBLE IN VARIOUS FORMATS AND LANGUAGES, INCLUDING AUDIO SCRIPTURE IN A NUMBER OF LANGUAGES TO ORGANISATIONS, CHURCHES, INDIVIDUALS. PRISONS AND HOSPITALS IN THE UK AND ETHIOPIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 14 Kendall House
199 warwick Road
London
W14 8PU
- Phone:
- 07912361449
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window