Financial history PYJAMA FAIRIES

Charity number: 1166993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.13k £30.10k £25.72k £33.03k £33.03k
Total expenditure £25.66k £24.93k £10.92k £41.18k £41.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A